Bank of America, N.A. v. Operture, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Operture, Inc. and Sedona Condominium Homeowners Association, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00383
Filed: February 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 1 Complaint. Sedona Condominium Homeowners Association, Inc. answer due 3/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 1 Complaint. Sedona Condominium Homeowners Association, Inc. answer due 2/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Motion to Extend Time. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/18/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Motion to Lift Stay of Case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Motion to Remove Attorney Karen A Whelan from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel. Attorneys Edgar C Smith, Krista Nielson and Eric Sebastian Powers terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STAYING CASE. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this case is administratively STAYED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Operture, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Powers
Represented By: Edgar C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Operture, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedona Condominium Homeowners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?