Zimmerman v. Einstein and Noah, Corp.
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Defendant: Einstein and Noah, Corp.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00403
Filed: February 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation to Extend Time. Einstein and Noah, Corp. answer due 7/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation for Extension to Respond to Complaint. Einstein and Noah, Corp. answer due 6/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OMNIBUS ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall unseal the Omnibus Order regarding the refiling of Plaintiffs certificate of interested parties in each of the above-listed cases. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall not file his amended certificates of interested parties under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal of Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs 7 is granted. Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby deemed withdrawn. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until 4/7/17 to pay the $400 filing fee in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that this case is transferred to Chief Judge Gloria Navarro and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. All future filings for this case must bear case number 2:17-cv-00403-GMN-GWF. Plaintiff must file a copy of this Order in any future ADA case he files in this district. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Plaintiff's 1 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court hereby SETS a hearing on that application for 11:00 a.m. on February 16, 2017, in Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 02/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmerman v. Einstein and Noah, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Einstein and Noah, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Represented By: Whitney C Wilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?