Zimmerman v. Ross Dress for Less, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Defendant: Ross Dress for Less, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00423
Filed: February 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation to Extend Time. Ross Dress for Less, Inc. answer due 5/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OMNIBUS ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall unseal the Omnibus Order regarding the refiling of Plaintiffs certificate of interested parties in each of the above-listed cases. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall not file his amended certificates of interested parties under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal of Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs 5 is granted. Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby deemed withdrawn. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until 4/7/17 to pay the $400 filing fee in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that this case is transferred to Chief Judge Gloria Navarro and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. All future filings for this case must bear case number 2:17-cv-00423-GMN-GWF. Plaintiff must file a copy of this Order in any future ADA case he files in this district. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmerman v. Ross Dress for Less, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Dress for Less, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Represented By: Whitney C Wilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?