Zimmerman v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00435
Filed: February 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 9 Complaint (Fifth Request). Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. answer due 9/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation to Extend Time re 9 Complaint (Third Request). Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. answer due 7/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 9 Complaint (First Request). Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. answer due 5/18/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall unseal the Omnibus Order regarding the refiling of Plaintiff's certificate of interested parties in each of the above-listed cases. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall not file his amended certificates of interested parties under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 5 Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal of Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until 4/7/2017 to pay the & #036;400 filing fee in this case. If the filing fee is paid, 1 -1 the Complaint will be filed and the action may proceed. If Plaintiff fails to pay the filing fee by that date, this case will be closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that this case is transferred to Chief Judge Gloria Navarro and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. All future filings for this case must bear case number 2:17-cv-00435-GMN-GWF. Plaintiff must file a copy of this Order in any future ADA case he files in this district. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmerman v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Represented By: Whitney C Wilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?