Florencio v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: George Florencio
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv00451
Filed: February 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 22 Stipulation; Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that 19 Stipulated Protective Order is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation re Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 6/5/2018. Motions due by 7/5/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florencio v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Florencio
Represented By: Michael A. Kristof
Represented By: Paul D Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert W Freeman, Jr.
Represented By: Pamela L. McGaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?