Ramos-Rodriguez v. Beck et al
Plaintiff: Manuel Ramos-Rodriguez
Defendant: Alyn Beck, Timothy Browder, Dr Duran, Garrett Escartin, K Holloway, Raffi Kotoyan, Joe Lambardo, Antonio Laurenco, Kevin McMahill, H. Porter, Renolds, Brian Rich, Richard Thomas and Dr. Zinser
Case Number: 2:2017cv00498
Filed: February 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 8 plaintiff Manuel Ramos-Rodriguez's motion for refund of the filing fee in case number 2:17-cv-00498-APG-PAL is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall refund any filing fees paid in this cas e to: Manuel Ramos-Rodriguez CCDC #1212984, Clark County Detention Center, 330 S. Casino Center Blvd., Las Vegas, NV 89101. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clark County Detention Center shall no longer forward any funds from Manuel Ramos-Rodriguez&# 039;s account to pay the filing fee in this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall send a copy of this order to the finance division of the clerk's office and to the CCDC Accounting Supervisor, 330 S. Casino Center Blvd., Las Vegas, NV 89101. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance, CCDC Accounting Supervisor - ADR)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the clerk of court shall take the complaint that is docketed in this case at 1 -1 and file it in case number 2:15-cv-01212-GMN-NJK as if it were filed on 2/16/17 in that case. The clerk of court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 3 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $11.78 toward the full $350 filing fee. He shall have until 5/10/2017. The complaint shall be retained but summons not issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: CCDC - JM)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall RETAIN Plaintiff Juan Manuel Ramos Rodriguez's Complaint 1 -1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall MAIL Plaintiff a blank form Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis for incarcerated litigants with instructions. Plaintiff shall have until 4/5/17, to file the Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos-Rodriguez v. Beck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alyn Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Browder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett Escartin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raffi Kotoyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Lambardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Laurenco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McMahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Zinser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Ramos-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?