Baldwin v. Geico General Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Roger Dorn Baldwin
Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company, Michael Y. Habte and Nellis Cab, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00807
Filed: March 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 5 Motion to Sever; ORDER denying 6 Motion to Remand to State Court; ORDER granting 8 Motion to Remand to State Court; ORDER denying 10 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER denying 11 Motion to Stay Case; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: State Court with Certified Docket - JM)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 37 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 32 Status Report. The Court hereby CONTINUES the stay of discovery on the extra-contractual claims until the earlier of either November 15, 2017, or the resolution of GEICO's dispositive motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re 26 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Hearing set for 6/1/2017 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order or status report due by 5/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldwin v. Geico General Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Dorn Baldwin
Represented By: Richard A Englemann
Represented By: Michael C. Kane
Represented By: Bradley J. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan W Carlson
Represented By: Wade M. Hansard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Y. Habte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nellis Cab, LLC.
Represented By: Michael D Falater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?