Rosa v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rita Rosa
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00874
Filed: March 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that a Status Hearing is scheduled for 12/6/2018 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The status hearing will be vacated upon the filing of a proposed stipulation and order for dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 17 Notice of Dissociation of Counsel. The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to remove Ms. Entzminger from the CM/ECF distribution list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. Accordingly, the parties 11 stipulated proposed discovery plan and scheduling order, is hereby Denied. The parties shall submit a stipulated proposed discovery plan and scheduling order that complies with the Local Rules, no later than April 19, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 04/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined in this Order, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Striking Plaintiff's 5 Notice of Discovery Conference and instructs the parties to refrain from filing discovery documents on the docket in the future absent a Court order that they do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosa v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Rosa
Represented By: Steven M. Burris
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Galliher
Represented By: Michael A. Koning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Brenda H Entzminger
Represented By: Timothy David Kuhls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?