shannon v. Decker et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Shannon
Defendant: Joseph Decker, Steve George and Donald Soderberg
Case Number: 2:2017cv00875
Filed: March 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 19 the defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT ACCORDINGLY and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief In Support of 19 Motion to Dismiss (Second Request). Replies due by 12/18/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 19 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Responses due by 11/30/2017. Replies due by 12/15/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. Based on 15 the parties' stipulation and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 12 the defendants' motion to dismiss is DEEMED WITHDRAWN; plaintiffs must promptly file their Second Amended Complaint ( 15 at Exhibit A); and defendants have until 11/1/2017, to answer or otherwise respond to it. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 12 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Responses due by 9/18/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 10 Stipulation to Extend Time. Joseph Decker answer due 8/1/2017; Steve George answer due 8/1/2017; Donald Soderberg answer due 8/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: shannon v. Decker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Soderberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Shannon
Represented By: Leon Marc Greenberg
Represented By: James P. Kemp
Represented By: Dana Sniegocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?