Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Faith Lee, E. W., H. W., M. W., Harmani Wilson, Jesse Wilson, Mario Wilson and Petra Wilson
Case Number: 2:2017cv00900
Filed: March 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the parties shall file, within 7 days of this order, a status report regarding Ms. Wilson's bankruptcy proceeding and what, if any, action the court needs to take to resolve this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall also apprise the court of whether they intend to substitute someone to replace Ms. Lee as a party pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(a). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the parties shall file a status report within seven (7) days of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER re 111 Order. The court will disburse to Wilson half of the interest in the amount of $842.47. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 90 Wilson's motion for reconsideration be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 97 Wilson's ex parte motion for expedited consideration for release of undisputed insurance funds be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. See Order for details. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 89 pro se Defendant Petra Wilson's Motion For Pro Se Litigant To File Electronically is GRANTED. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Re: Petra Wilson's 97 Motion for Expedited Consideration for Release of Undisputed Insurance Funds. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2018 at 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove the ex parte status on the 97 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting 95 Motion to Continue Hearing re 92 Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for 10:00 AM, 8/21/2018 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 1:30 PM, 8/29/2018, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the discovery hearing scheduled for 9/7/2018 is VACATED and ADVANCED to 10:00 AM, 8/21/2018, in Courtroom 3D. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on 89 Petra Wilson's Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically is scheduled for 10:00 AM, 8/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 84 Petra Wilson's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Counsel of Record is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a discovery hearing is scheduled for 10:00 AM, 9/7/2018, in Courtroom 3D. The Clerk of Court is d irected to mail a copy of this order to Petra Wilson at 378 Sanctuary Court, Henderson, Nevada 89014. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 61 Wilson's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that 66 Lee's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all discovery is stayed in this case until the earlier of thirty (30) days after the Court decides on 66 the pending Motion for Summary Judgment or 7/18/2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for 5/3/2018 is VACATED. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER. The discovery extension requested by the parties does not set a date certain for the discovery cut-off and 74 the stipulation will not be approved in this form. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all discovery is stayed in this case until the earli er of thirty (30) days after the Court decides on 66 the pending Motion for Summary Judgment or 4/30/2018. See Order for further details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 50 the R&R is ADOPTED in part and REJECTED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before 10/15/2017, plaintiff shall pay into court the One Hundred Twenty-five Thousand Dollars ($ ;125,000) death benefit due as of 12/2/2016, plus interest accrued under the terms of the policy, less $6,000 in fees and costs. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - MR)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 5 Faith Lee's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 17 Faith Lee's proposed order be, and the same hereby is, STRICKEN from the record. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED AS FOLLOWS:1. On or before a date set by the district judge, plaintiff should pay into court the One Hundred Twenty-five Thousand Dollars ($125,000) Death Benefit due as of 12/2/2016, plus interest accrued under the terms of the policy, less $6,000 in fees and costs; 2. Upon payment of that sum into court, defendants should be enjoined from instituting or prosecuting any proceeding in any state or United States court affectin g the Death Benefit and/or the Servicemenbers' Group Life Insurance Plan, group policy number G-32000 ("SGLI Plan"); 3. Upon payment of that sum into court, plaintiff should be discharged from any and all further liability to defen dants relating in any way to the SGLI Plan and/or Death Benefit; and 4. Faith Lee's 5 Motion for Summary Judgment should be denied. Objections to R&R due by 8/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that 35 Defendant Fiath Lee's Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 12 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. The cheduling Conference is rescheduled for 6/26/2017 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Plaintiff's counsel may appear telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faith Lee
Represented By: Patrick A. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmani Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petra Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Ann-Martha Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?