The Bank of New York Mellon v. Pomeroy et al
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Defendant: Anytime Plumbing, Clifford L Casey, Paradise Spa, LLC, Nikki M. Pomeroy and Republic Silver State Disposal, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00939
Filed: April 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting Defendant Casey's 65 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court dismisses claim one and claim two as time barred. The court dismissesclaim three without prejudice, declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction. The Court dismisse s claim four as it is a form of relief.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's 64 Motion to Amend isDENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's 63 Motion to Stay is DENIEDas moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/30/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting 71 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 65 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. Clifford L. Casey's Replies due by 10/10/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting 46 Motion to Stay Dispositive Motion and Pretrial Order Deadlines pending resolution of the Certified Question currently pending before the Nevada Supreme Court or until resolution of 29 Amended Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 42 Motion to Stay Discovery pending resolution of its 41 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined in this Order, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Republic Silver State Disposal, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bank of New York Mellon v. Pomeroy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anytime Plumbing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford L Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradise Spa, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikki M. Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Silver State Disposal, Inc.
Represented By: Donald H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?