Sabatini v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Plaintiff: John Sabatini
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Case Number: 2:2017cv01012
Filed: April 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 58 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 57 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER granting 60 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejdudice; Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying 38 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 39 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; ORDER denying 40 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; ORDER granting 41 Motion for Summary Judgment. M otion for limited summary-judgment due by 4/8/2019. All claims against individual defendants Devin Ballard and Patrick Neville are DISMISSED from this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 51 Stipulation; Re: 41 Motion for Summary Judgment, 40 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 38 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Replies due by 9/28/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Stipulation; Motions due by 6/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 32 Stipulation; Motions due by 6/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 30 Stipulation; Discovery due by 4/15/2018. Motions due by 5/15/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that Plaintiffs shall have until July 28, 2017 to file to file and serve a motion to consolidate in Case no 2:17-cv-01012 JAD-NJK. Defendants shall have 14 days from service of the motion to consolidate to file a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: Motion for temporary restraining order 7 . Metro has until June 2, 2017, to respond to Sabatini's motion. Sabatini must file any reply by 3 p.m. on June 6, 2017. The motion hearing re motion for temporary restraining order 7 is set for 6/7/2017 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabatini v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Nicholas Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sabatini
Represented By: Marc J Randazza
Represented By: Alex J. Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?