MGM Resorts International et al v. John Does 1-10
Plaintiff: MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Resort Group and Mirage Resorts, Incorporated
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2017cv01101
Filed: April 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 26 Motion to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: 12 Amended Complaint. Quality King Fragrance, Inc. answer due 1/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re: 24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant La Mina de Oro, Inc. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time re 12 Amended Complaint (First Request). La Mina De Oro, Inc. answer due 12/18/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that 5 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoenas and for Extension of Time is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting 6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jonathan W Fountain withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MGM Resorts International et al v. John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MGM Resorts International
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Zachary T. Gordon
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandalay Resort Group
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Zachary T. Gordon
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirage Resorts, Incorporated
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Zachary T. Gordon
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?