Bank of New York Mellon v. Yorkshire Manor Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Defendant: Alysse V. Campaigne, Jeffrey B. Campaigne and Yorkshire Manor Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv01145
Filed: April 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2409(a) Quiet Title Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 36 Stipulated/Consent Judgment Quieting Title in the Name of the Bank of New York and Dismissing the Complaint with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Joint Status Report Regarding Pending Settlement. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (Fifth Request). Yorkshire Manor Association answer due 10/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 925/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (Fourth Request). Yorkshire Manor Association answer due 9/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 15 Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute the Unknown Heirs of Jeffrey B. Campaigne and to allow service of process by publication against the remaining defendant is GRANTED. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (Second Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 Stipulation to Extend Time. Yorkshire Manor Association answer due 8/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting 8 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Yorkshire Manor Association answer due 6/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of New York Mellon v. Yorkshire Manor Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Thomas Beckom
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alysse V. Campaigne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey B. Campaigne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yorkshire Manor Association
Represented By: Karen M. Ayarbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?