Zimmerman v. Terrible Herbst, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Defendant: Terrible Herbst, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01153
Filed: April 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting 11 Stipulation to Extend Time. Terrible Herbst, Inc. answer due 7/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting 8 Stipulation Extending Time. Terrible Herbst, Inc. answer due 6/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmerman v. Terrible Herbst, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrible Herbst, Inc.
Represented By: Allison List Kheel
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Represented By: Whitney C Wilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?