Christopher v. State of Nevada, ex. rel. Nevada Supreme Court
Plaintiff: Palmer Christopher
Defendant: State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2017cv01225
Filed: May 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 5 defendant State of Nevada's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. This case is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting 8 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 5 Motion to Dismiss (Second Request). Responses due by 6/26/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting 6 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 5 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Responses due by 6/20/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher v. State of Nevada, ex. rel. Nevada Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palmer Christopher
Represented By: Andrew L Rempfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Represented By: Laura Michelle Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?