1st One Hundred Investment Pool, LLC v. Rose et al
Plaintiff: 1st One Hundred Investment Pool, LLC
Defendant: 12017 Oakland Hills Drive Irrevocable Trust, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, Capitol Commerce Mortgage Company, Fashion Show Mall, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., Scot Oliphant, Xavier Reyes, Carmen J. Rose, Sables, LLC, State of Nevada, Tal Xavier Trust and Tal Zissu
Case Number: 2:2017cv01233
Filed: May 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 5/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 41 plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall prepare and submit to the court within thirty (30) days a proposed order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 36 defendant BNYM's motion to reconsider be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that 26 Motion to Remand to State Court is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cert copies of order & docket sheet to 8th Judicial District Court - MMM)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 14 plaintiff's emergency motion be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED plaintiff shall file his certificate of interested parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than 6/7/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting 3 Stipulation Extending Deadlines. Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company answer due 5/23/2017. Motions due by 6/15/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1st One Hundred Investment Pool, LLC v. Rose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 12017 Oakland Hills Drive Irrevocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company
Represented By: Patrick James Davis
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Commerce Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fashion Show Mall, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scot Oliphant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen J. Rose
Represented By: J. S. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sables, LLC
Represented By: Christopher S Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tal Xavier Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tal Zissu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1st One Hundred Investment Pool, LLC
Represented By: Vernon Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?