Schmitt v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Robert K Schmitt
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2017cv01349
Filed: May 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Social Security: Black Lung
Cause of Action: 42:206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Reversal and/or Remand and Denying Defendant's 25 Cross-Motion to Affirm. Plaintiff's 21 Motion to Compel and 27 Motion to Quash are Denied as moot. This matter is remanded to D efendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, for an award of benefits with an onset date of 4/26/2010. The Clerk of the Court shall enter a final judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying without Prejudice Plaintiff's 10 Motion for Final Decision. The Commissioner shall file an answer by 9/22/2017. The court will issue a scheduling order setting a briefing schedule shortly after the Commissioner files an answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court SHALL FILE 1 -1 the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel for the Commissioner shall file a statement with the court by 8/11/17, indicating whether the Commissioner acknowledges effective service, has any claim regarding service, or deems the attempted service not effective. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmitt v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Michael Kramer Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert K Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?