Trell v. McCune et al
Plaintiff: Lynn Elyse Trell
Defendant: Stephen F McCune and Swift Transportation Co. LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv01401
Filed: May 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 46 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 33 Stipulation re Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 7/27/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 Stipulation re Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 5/16/2018. Motions due by 6/18/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation for Entry of Confidentiality Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that 12 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Their Answer is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing set in this matter for August 29, 2017 is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trell v. McCune et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen F McCune
Represented By: Bruce Scott Dickinson
Represented By: Jacquelyn M. Franco
Represented By: Michael E. Hottman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co. LLC
Represented By: Bruce Scott Dickinson
Represented By: Jacquelyn M. Franco
Represented By: Michael E. Hottman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Elyse Trell
Represented By: Joseph A. Gutierrez
Represented By: Jason Maier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?