Blue Sunsets LLC et al v. Kontilai et al
Plaintiff: Blue Sunsets LLC and Jencess Software and Technologies Inc
Defendant: Collectors Coffee Inc and Mykalai Kontilai
Unknown: Timothy J. Dennin
Case Number: 2:2017cv01418
Filed: May 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 37 Stipulation to Extend Time re 4 SEALED MOTION to Seal re 1 Complaint. ( Replies due by 7/7/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 33 Stipulation to Extend Time re 4 SEALED MOTION to Seal 1 Complaint. (Responses due by 6/30/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 27 Defendant's motion to seal is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall unseal ECF Nos. 27 , 28 , and 29 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 28 , 29 the parties' pending stipulations to extend briefing deadlines are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that 21 and 24 Motions to Seal are DENIED. The Clerk shall unseal ECF Nos. 10 , 21 , 22 , 24 , 25 , and 26 . The Clerk shall also unseal this Court's order (ECF No. 23 ) granting the parties' stipulation to extend briefing deadlines. FURTHER ORDERED that 25 and 26 Stipulations to Extend Time are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk shall SEAL 1 Plaintiffs' complaint and 4 the motion to seal pending the Court's decision on the motion. Briefing will proceed in the normal course. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' mot ion will not be heard on an ex parte basis. Defendants shall serve a copy of 4 their motion on Plaintiffs within 3 days of the date of this order. Briefing will then proceed along normal deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Sunsets LLC et al v. Kontilai et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Sunsets LLC
Represented By: Jordan J Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jencess Software and Technologies Inc
Represented By: Timothy J. Dennin
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Timothy J. Dennin
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collectors Coffee Inc
Represented By: Robert T. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mykalai Kontilai
Represented By: Robert T. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?