Payan v. Sallie Mae, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ana M. Payan
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc, Ginny's Inc, Midland Mortgage, Sallie Mae, Inc., State Farm Bank, FSB, Trans Union LLC and Webbank
Case Number: 2:2017cv01460
Filed: May 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Granting 83 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Navient Solutions fka Sallie Mae, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Granting 80 Stipulation of Dismissal of Experian Information Solutions, Inc., with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re 64 Notice to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default. IT IS ORDERED that 54 the Clerk's Entry of Default as to Sallie Mae, Inc. is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 65 Stipulation of Dismissal of State Farm Bank, FSB with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting 60 Stipulation of Dismissal of Trans Union LLC. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 55 Stipulation of Dismissal of Webbank. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 49 Stipulation of Dismissal of Midland Mortgage. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 45 Stipulation Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 35 Stipulation to Extend Time. Midland Mortgage answer due 7/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation to Extend Time. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 7/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Webbank answer due 7/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 11 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting 6 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 6/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting 4 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Trans Union LLC answer due 7/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payan v. Sallie Mae, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Represented By: Andrew J Sharples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginny's Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sallie Mae, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Bank, FSB
Represented By: James Ernest Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Jason Revzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webbank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana M. Payan
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?