Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Vegas Property Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc, Spanish Trail Master Association and Vegas Property Services Inc
Counter Defendant: R. GLEN WOODS, as Trustee of WATSON 2005 TRUST, Jeannie Watson and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Counter Claimant: Vegas Property Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv01463
Filed: May 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 68 Motion to Dismiss. It is granted with respect to Plaintiff's first through fourth causes of action and denied with respect to Plaintiff's fifth cause of action. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting ECF No. 82 Stipulation Extending Briefing on Motions (Second Request) ECF No. 68 Motion to Dismiss. Reply due by 2/8/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting ECF No. 79 Stipulation To Extend Time re ECF No. 68 Motion to Dismiss: The Association's reply is due by 1/9/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 IT IS ORDERED that:1. The Motion to Withdraw (ECF No. 74 ) is GRANTED. 2. The Substitutions of Attorney (ECF No. 76 , 78 ) are GRANTED. 3. Luis Ayon and Allison Schmidt of Ayon Law, PLLC are substituted in the place of John Wright for Vegas Property Services, Inc, subject to the provisions of LR IA 11-6(b), (c) and (d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER approving ECF No. 72 Stipulation re ECF No. 68 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 12/21/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting ECF No. 69 Stipulation : Spanish Trail Master Association Response to ECF No. 68 Motion to Dismiss due by 12/7/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting ECF No. 27 Stipulation : Response to ECF No. 16 Motion to Dismiss due by 8/18/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATION of Issue to State Court; directing Clerk to serve a copy of this order on the NV AG (mailed 6/19/2017). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Vegas Property Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spanish Trail Master Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vegas Property Services Inc
Represented By: John Henry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: R. GLEN WOODS, as Trustee of WATSON 2005 TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jeannie Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Nathan Guy Kanute
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Vegas Property Services Inc
Represented By: John Henry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Nathan Guy Kanute
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?