Bear Omnimedia LLC v. Mania Media LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bear Omnimedia LLC
Defendant: Bear World Media Ltd, CM Publications Limited, Domains By Proxy LLC, Mania Media LLC, PayPal, Inc. and Steven Tilotta
Case Number: 2:2017cv01478
Filed: May 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE granting 131 Stipulation. (The remaining defendants other than Mania Media LLC that have appeared all have been terminated.) Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting ECF No. 129 Motion to Remove Counsel from Electronic Service List. Kurt R. Bonds, Esq. and Adam R. Knecht of Alverson Taylor & Sanders removed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER that Mania's Motion to Dismiss ECF No. 116 is granted in part and denied in part; Plaintiff's trademark dilution and common law injury to business reputation claims are dismissed with leave to amend; plaintiff to file fourth amended complaint by 11/1/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDERED that Mania's Anti-SLAPP Motion (ECF No. 97 ) is denied. It is further ordered that Instagram's 12(b)(6) Motion (ECF No. 100 ) is granted. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting ECF No. 104 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Webid Consulting, LTD. All claims against Defendant Webid Consulting, LTD., DBA Bearworld.com and Bear411.com are dismissed with prejudice; each party shall bear their own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting ECF No. 90 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to ECF No. 58 Third Amended Complaint. Defendant Mania Media LLC's answer/response due by 1/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting ECF No. 83 Motion to Extend Time : Mania Media LLC's answer to ECF No. 58 Third Amended Complaint due by 1/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting ECF No. 78 Stipulation to Extend Time to File a response to ECF No. 58 Third Amended Complaint. Instagram LLC response/answer due 1/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bear Omnimedia LLC v. Mania Media LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bear Omnimedia LLC
Represented By: Wolfe Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bear World Media Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CM Publications Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domains By Proxy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mania Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayPal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Tilotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?