U.S. Bank National Association v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Southern Highlands Community Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv01485
Filed: May 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER re 91 Notice of Settlement. IT IS ORDERED that the settling parties shall have until 5/1/2019 to either file a stipulation to dismiss with prejudice, or a joint status report advising when the stipulation to dismiss will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting 84 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 75 Motion for Summary Judgment (First Request). Replies due by 1/18/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 77 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 72 Order (Fifth Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting 71 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 68 Order (Fourth Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting 61 Stipulation of Dismissal re Southern HighlandsCommunity Association. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 57 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 38 Motion for Judgment (Third Request). Responses due by 6/12/2018. Replies due by 7/6/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 53 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 34 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim (First Request). Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. answer due 5/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 51 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 38 Motion for Judgment (Second Request). Responses due by 5/29/2018. Replies due by 6/26/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 46 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 38 Motion for Judgment (First Request). Responses due by 5/14/2018. Replies due by 6/4/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 42 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 34 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim (First Request). U.S. Bank National Association answer due 4/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 18 Motion to Dismiss (Second Request). Responses due by 10/9/2017. Replies due by 10/30/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 18 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Responses due by 10/2/2017. Replies due by 10/23/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 14 defendant's demand for security costs, be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall post a cost bond in the amount of $500.00 or make a cash deposit of $500.00 as to defendant within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Highlands Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Robin E Perkins
Represented By: Adam Q. Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?