HSBC Bank, USA, National Association v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: HSBC Bank, USA, National Association
Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Via Valencia/Via Ventura Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv01512
Filed: May 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER to Return Bond. The cash deposit in the amount of $500.00, tendered to the Clerk of Court on or about August 3, 2017, and any accrued interest shall be returned to HSBC Bank, USA, National Association. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Finance - JM)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 60 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Stipulation to Amend Complaint; Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 43 Stipulation to Stay Case; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 16 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. The CLERK OF COURT is directed to accept the deposit of $500.00 from plaintiff under NRS 18.130. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is stayed by operation of NRS 18.130(1) until the $500 is deposited. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HSBC Bank, USA, National Association v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Via Valencia/Via Ventura Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HSBC Bank, USA, National Association
Represented By: Alexandria LaVonne Layton
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?