Cutts v. Richland Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Cutts
Defendant: Caleb J. Langsdale, Clifford Molin and Richland Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01525
Filed: May 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 73 plaintiff's motion for stay of execution be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the instant action is STAYED pending the final resolution of plaintiff's appeal. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Clifford Molin and Richland Holdings, Inc., in the amount of $50,239.50. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 59 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to The Langsdale Law Firm, P.C.; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re 56 Status Report. Stipulation for Dismissal or Joint Status Report due by 11/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 27 Motion to Quash Subpoenas. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 9 defendant Langsdale's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 10 defendant ASN's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 1 plaintiff's complaint be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cutts v. Richland Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cutts
Represented By: Vernon Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caleb J. Langsdale
Represented By: Timothy J Lepore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Molin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richland Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Chad Clement
Represented By: Jonathan B. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?