Crisafulli v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Derek Crisafulli
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01584
Filed: June 6, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Re: 42 Notice of Settlement. Plaintiff Derek Crisafulli need not file a Notice Acceptance with Offer of Judgment as previously ordered. The parties shall file either a stipulation to dismiss or a status report regarding settlement on or before 11/20/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Denying as moot Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall properly file the acceptance document under the Notice Acceptance with Offer of Judgment event by 9/24/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 29 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 27 Motion to Strike. Defendant's Responses due by 4/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Second Stipulation to Extend Deadline re Dispositive Motion and Joint Interim Status Report. Deadline: 3/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crisafulli v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Crisafulli
Represented By: Stephen G. Clough
Represented By: Albert N Lasso
Represented By: Evan K. Simonsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Jerry S. Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?