Del Rivero v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Javier Del Rivero
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv01606
Filed: June 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AMENDED JUDGMENT for Attorney's Fees. Plaintiff's counsel shall pay defendant PRA a total amount of $6,975.00 at the conclusion of this case. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 6/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Modified on 6/13/2018 to correct typo (MMM).
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that 54 Joint Motion to Amend Order and Judgment is GRANTED.FURTHER ORDERED that the court's order awarding attorneys' fees (ECF No. 49 ) is an award against plaintiff's counsel.FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court must amend the clerk's judgment (ECF No. 50 ) in accordance with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC against Javier Del Rivero. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 6/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER that 43 Motion to Extend Discovery is GRANTED. The discovery period in this case shall remain open until April 18, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 40 Motion to Remove Attorney Andrew Cummings from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation to Seal Exhibits re: 22 Motion to Compel, 27 Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 31 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re: 22 Motion to Compel. Responses due by 1/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation re Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 3/19/2018. Motions due by 4/13/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting 8 Motion to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re 1 Complaint. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 7/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Modified on 7/25/2017 to correct typographical error(TR).
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that 6 Motion to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re 1 Complaint is GRANTED. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC answer due 7/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Rivero v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Del Rivero
Represented By: Vernon Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Represented By: Wing Yan Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?