Dunlap Sr. v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Marvin Dunlap Sr.
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc, Trans Union, LLC and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01639
Filed: June 13, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant Trans Union, LLC only. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 19, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 7 Stipulation to Extend Time. Trans Union, LLC answer due 8/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 13, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 4 Stipulation re 1 Complaint. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. answer due 7/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunlap Sr. v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Dunlap Sr.
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Sean N. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Karl O Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?