Williams v. Wells Fargo Card Services et al

Plaintiff: Riley L. Williams
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Card Services and Wells Fargo Financial Cards
Case Number: 2:2017cv01655
Filed: June 14, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 18, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (Second Request). Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 9/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 5, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). TransUnion, LLC. answer due 10/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 30, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 22 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 11 Amended Complaint (Third Request). Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 9/12/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 21, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 16 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (Second Request). Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 8/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 16, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 14 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 2, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 9 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 8/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 28, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 6 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Wells Fargo Card Services and Wells Fargo Financial Cards answer due 7/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Wells Fargo Card Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Card Services
Represented By: Tanya N. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Financial Cards
Represented By: Tanya N. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riley L. Williams
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?