Johnson v. Gentry et al
Plaintiff: Lausteveion Johnson
Defendant: Adams, Barrit, F. Dreesen, James Dzurenda, Estate of J Gentry, Gentry, Knatz, Joseph Lewis and David Willis
Case Number: 2:2017cv01671
Filed: June 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Warden of Northern Nevada Correctional Center, Carson City, NV, or designee, to arrange for and produce Lausteveion Johnson, #82138, for a videoconference hearing via Zoom Technology, on Thursday, 7/8/2022, at 9:00 a.m. Mr. Johnson shall remain in the custody of the Warden, Northern Nevada Correctional Center, Carson City, NV at all times. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/31/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER to Produce Inmate for Videoconference. I THEREFORE RESPECTFULLY ORDER the Warden of Northern Nevada Correctional Center, Carson City, NV, or designee, to arrange for and produce Lausteveion Johnson, #82138, for a videoconference hearing via Zoom Technology, on Tuesday, 5/24/2022, at 3:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/20/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Warden of Northern Nevada Correctional Center, Carson City, NV, or designee, to arrange for and produce Lausteveion Johnson, #82138, for a videoconference hearing via Zoom Technology, on Friday, 5/20/2022, at 9:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/10/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Frank M. Flansburg III, Emily A. Ellis, and Tory P. Domina are hereby appointed as pro bono counsel for Plaintiff Lausteveion Johnson pursuant to the United States District Court for the District of Nevadas Pro Bono Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part 135 Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Counsel or, in the Alternative, Motion for Limited Appointment of Counsel and Request for Oral Argument via Video. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 1/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF -cc: Pro Bono Liaison - JQC)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 124 Plaintiffs Request for Electronic Copy of Court Orders is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 121 the parties Joint Pretrial Order is REJECTED. The parties shall confer as required in Local Rule 16-3 and submit a Joint Pretrial Order that complies with Local Rules 16-3 and 16-4 by 12/10/2021. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/27/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the proposed joint pretrial order is due 10/22/2021. Failure to comply may result in sanctions up to and including dismissal. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Granting 116 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/4/2021. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 108 plaintiff Lausteveion Johnsons motion for clarification is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the defendants believe further discovery is needed, they must file a properly supported motion to reopen discovery on this claim only by 8/16/2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the proposed joint pretrial order is still due by 9/2/2021. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/4/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 82 , 86 , 93 , 105 the parties Joint Pretrial Orders are REJECTED. The parties shall confer as required in Local Rule 16-3 and submit a Joint Pretrial Order that complies with Local Rules 16-3 and 16-4 by 9/2/2021. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 81 and 87 Plaintiff Lausteveion Johnsons Requests for Settlement Conference Via Video are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 6/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 77 Motion to Extend Time; Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that by 5/21/2021, the parties shall file the proposed joint pretrial order. The failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/29/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff Lausteveion Johnsons claims against the Doe defendants and defendant Adams are DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to timely serve. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 72 plaintiff Lausteveion Johnsons motion for or al argument is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 61 the defendants motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in part as set forth in this order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting 62 Motion for Leave to File Document. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 53 Motion; Discovery due by 6/3/2020. Motions due by 7/3/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER. This case has been assigned to the undersigned Magistrate Judge by random draw. Because his impartiality might reasonably be questioned, the undersigned must recuse himself from the above entitled and numbered case. 28 U.S.C. § 455 Code of Conduct for United States Judges, Canon 3(C)(1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER. I THEREFORE ORDER that 44 plaintiff Johnson's objection is GRANTED IN PART. Magistrate Judge Ferenbach's order is modified to allow Johnson to amend his complaint to add allegations directly related to the incident where his he ad was allegedly slammed into a gate, but not about religious discrimination. I FURTHER ORDER that 46 Johnson's motion for oral argument on his motion is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Denying 32 , 33 , 34 Motions to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDERED that 21 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Defendants is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Service on Defendants Jo Gentry and David Willis must be perfected on or before February 11, 2019. FURTHER ORDERED that 20 Plaintiff's Req uest for the Court to Unseal Defendants' Addresses is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to reissue summons (under seal) with the sealed address of Gentry and Willis as provided in ECF NO. 16 to defendants Jo Gentry and David Willis her ein, and deliver same with copies of the Complaint, to the U.S. Marshal for service, and send blank copies of the USM-285 forms to the Plaintiff. Plaintiff has twenty (20) days in which to furnish to the U.S. Marshal the required Forms USM-285. Wit hin twenty (20) days after receiving from the U.S. Marshal a copy of the Form USM-285 showing whether service has been accomplished, plaintiff must file a notice with the Court identifying which defendants were served and which were not served, if any. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that, pursuant to the Court's screening order (ECF No. 4 ), this action shall proceed on the following claims: Count I will proceed against Defendants Lewis, Gentry, Dzurenda, Knatz, Adams, Dreesen, and Barrit, and will proceed against John Doe doctor, John Doe nurse, and mental health staffer Jane Doe, when Plaintiff learns their identities and amends the complaint to include those identities; the portion of Count II alleging an Eighth Amendment claim for deliberate indifference to serious medical needs will proceed against Defendants Dzurenda and Gentry and will proceed against Defendant Jane Doe mental health staffer when Plaintiff discovers her identity and amends the complaint to include her identity; and the portion of Count II alleging an Eighth Amendment conditions of confinement claim will proceed against Defendants Willis, Jo Gentry, Adams, Dreesen, Lewis, and Dzurenda.FURTHER ORDERED that 6 , 7 Plaintiff's Motions to Exclude from Mediation are g ranted.FURTHER ORDERED that 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall SEND a copy of this order to the Finance Division of the Clerk's Office, and also to the attention of the Chi ef of Inmate Services for the Nevada Department of Corrections. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall electronically SERVE a copy of this order, a copy of Plaintiff's complaint (ECF No. 1-1), and a copy of the screening order (EC F No. 4) on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada by adding the Attorney General of the State of Nevada to the docket sheet. This does not indicate acceptance of service. Service must be perfected within ninety (90) days from the date of this order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Subject to the findings of the screening order (ECF No. 4), within twenty-one (21) days of the date of entry of this order, the Attorney General's Office shall file a notice advising the Cou rt and Plaintiff of: (a) the names of the defendants for whom it accepts service; (b) the names of the defendants for whom it does not accept service, and (c) the names of the defendants for whom it is filing the last-known-address information under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Gentry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Dreesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of J Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lausteveion Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?