Dutraferea v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Jeannie Dutraferea
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2017cv01729
Filed: June 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 20 Motion for Reversal and Remand. Defendant's 23 Cross-Motion to Affirm is Denied. This matter is remanded to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, for an award of bene fits. The Clerk of the Court shall enter a final judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Motion to Extend Time (First Request) Re: 20 Motion to Remand and to File Cross-Motion to Affirm. Defendant's Responses to 20 Motion and Cross-Motion due by 3/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Consent Motion to Extend Time re Briefing Schedule. Cross-Motions to reverse or remand and to affirm the Commissioner's decision due by 1/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Amended Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. The Clerk of the Court shall also issue summons to the Com missioner of the Social Security Administration and Attorney General of the United States. Plaintiff shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration and the Attorney General. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dutraferea v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannie Dutraferea
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?