Duerson v. Sunrise Children's Foundation
Plaintiff: Adrian Duerson
Defendant: Sunrise Children's Foundation
Case Number: 2:2017cv01792
Filed: June 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Adopting 5 Report and Recommendation. FURTHER ORDERED that the instant case be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (1) that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice to Plaintiff's ability to commence a new action; (2) the Clerk of the Court be instructed to close this case and enter judgment accordingly. Objections to R&R due by 9/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the Clerk file Complaint, but not issue summons. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed with leave to file an amendment. Amended Complaint deadline: 8/11/2017., Payment of filing fees or IFP due 8/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Complaint and IFP to P - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duerson v. Sunrise Children's Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Duerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Children's Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?