Ditech Financal LLC et al v. Resources Group LLC
Plaintiff: Ditech Financal LLC and Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: LN Management, LLC and Resources Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv01823
Filed: July 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 28 Resources Group, LLC as Trustee of the Reber Dr.Trust's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint is GRANTED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 36 Fannie Mae's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED i n part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Ditech Financial LLC and the Federal National Mortgage Association and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 28 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 1/14/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. The parties must meet and confer and file a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order by 12/27/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 26 the motion to lift stay is GRANTED IN PART, in that THE STAY IS LIFTED. Defendants Answer due 11/30/18 re 8 Amended Complaint. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due 11/30/18. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that THIS CASE IS STAYED for all purposes. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 11 , 13 the pending dispositive motions are DENIED without prejudice to their refiling once the stay is lifted, and 14 the motion to stay discovery is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation to Extend Time re 11 MOTION to Dismiss re 8 Amended Complaint. (Responses due by 9/18/2017.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ditech Financal LLC et al v. Resources Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ditech Financal LLC
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LN Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resources Group, LLC
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Represented By: Adam R Trippiedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?