Tausinga v. Golden Gaming, LLC
Plaintiff: Jennifer Tausinga
Defendant: Golden Gaming, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv01825
Filed: July 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Stipulation re 17 Order on Stipulation (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. The Court ORDERS the parties to file a stipulation of dismissal no later than 11/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 10 Stipulation to File a First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tausinga v. Golden Gaming, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Gaming, LLC
Represented By: Anthony L. Martin
Represented By: Dana B Salmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Tausinga
Represented By: Mark J Bourassa
Represented By: Christopher W. Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?