U.S. Bank, N.A. v. Terrafirma Venture LLC et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Terrafirma Venture LLC and Treasures Landscape Maintenance Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv01890
Filed: July 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting 62 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 57 Motion to Dismiss, 58 Motion for Summary Judgment (Second Request). Responses due by 2/11/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting 60 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 57 Motion to Dismiss, 58 Motion for Summary Judgment (First Request). Responses due by 1/11/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER. The order to show cause is DISCHARGED. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Denying 17 , 19 Motions to Dismiss and 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report to the court within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report to the court within seven (7) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 42 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 2/9/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second Request). Replies due by 2/2/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 32 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 18 Motion for Summary Judgment and 19 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Replies due by 1/28/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond re: 18 Motion and 19 Motion. Responses due by 1/4/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 18 Motion for Summary Judgment and 19 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Responses due by 12/21/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation re 1 Complaint (Second Request). Defendants Answer due 11/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting 11 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Treasures Landscape Maintenance Association answer due 11/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 8 defendant's motion for demand for security of costs be, and the same hereby are, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall post security in the amount of $500.00 within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank, N.A. v. Terrafirma Venture LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrafirma Venture LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasures Landscape Maintenance Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Justin A Shiroff
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?