Hess v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Mayela F. Hess
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv01894
Filed: July 11, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 24 Notice of Settlement. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff and Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC to file a stipulation of dismissal no later than January 8, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 27, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 22 Notice of Settlement. Plaintiff and Defendant Equifax Information Services,LLC shall file a stipulation of dismissal no later than 12/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 15, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 18 Stipulated Protective Order. Counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined in this Order with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hess v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Lindsay C Demaree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayela F. Hess
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Sean N. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?