Smith v. Kellogg Company et al
Plaintiff: Jay J. Ammer, Andrew Brown, Richard Bush, Scott Chwascinski, Gary Feeney, Charles Aaron Gee, Felix Gregory, Renato Linsangan, Daniel P Muesenfechter, David W Phillips, Scotty Poarch, Gregory Ratliff, Brian Smith and William Vehlewald
Defendant: Kellogg Company and Kellogg Sales Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv01914
Filed: July 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER Granting 183 Second Motion to Amend. Defendants' 196 Motion for Leave to File a Surreply is Granted. Plaintiff's 185 Motion to Transfer is Granted. The claims of all Plaintiffs are TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Michigan. The clerk of the court shall transfer the case to that district and close this file. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER Denying Defendants' 187 Emergency Motion to Enforce Stay and to Strike Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. Defendants shall file a Response to Plaintiff's 183 Motion to Amend and 185 Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Granting Defendants' 55 Motion to Compel Arbitration. The case is stayed pending arbitration. The parties are ordered to file a joint status report by 9/15/2018 and every 180 days thereafter. Defendants' 85 Motion Reconsideration is Denied as moot. Defendants' 105 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority is Denied as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting 90 Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Supplemental Briefs Re: 79 Order allowing limited discovery on Defendants' 55 Motion to Compel. Supplemental Briefs due by 1/5/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 78 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 55 Motion to Compel. Defendantas' Replies due by 10/23/2017. Plaintiff has until 10/31/2017 to file a sur-reply no longer than five pages. Plaintiffs' 77 Motion to Strike Defendants' Reply to Motion to Compel Arbitration is Withdrawn. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Main Document 80 replaced on 10/26/2017) (SLD).
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER that Plaintiff's 67 Motion to Withdraw his Motion to Amend Complaint is Granted. Plaintiff's 31 Motion to Amend Complaint is Denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 16 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Notices of Filing of Consent to Joinder is granted. The Clerk shall strike ECF Nos. 8 , 9 and 13 from the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Kellogg Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay J. Ammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Brown
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bush
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Chwascinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Aaron Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renato Linsangan
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel P Muesenfechter
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W Phillips
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scotty Poarch
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Smith
Represented By: Alex Dumas
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Vehlewald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Sales Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?