JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Newport Cove III Owners Association, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Tsan-Li Yueh Sun
Case Number: 2:2017cv02035
Filed: July 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 46 Stipulation of Dismissal and Lift Stay. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. For reasons of judicial economy and to avoid inconsistent decisions, the Court will not consider any further motions until the parties have had the opportunity to receive and address the Nevada Supreme Court's opinion. IT IS FURTHER ORDE RED that 32 Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other pending motions are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation re 13 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 13 SFR's Demand for Security of Costs is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Joseph Sakai
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newport Cove III Owners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tsan-Li Yueh Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?