USROF lll Legal Title Trust 2015-1 v. TBD, LLC et al
Plaintiff: USROF lll Legal Title Trust 2015-1
Defendant: Airmotive Investments LLC, Highland Ranch Homeowners Association, Kern & Associates, Ltd., TBD, LLC and TBR I, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv02083
Filed: August 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this case is hereby STAYED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 25 Defendant Airmotive Investments LLC.'s Motion to Dismiss and 27 Defendant Highland Ranch Homeowners Association's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Denying 37 Stipulation to Extend Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) Modified on 10/31/2017 to correct disposition (ADR).
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation to Extend Time. Kern & Associates, Ltd. answer due 10/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Stipulation to Extend Time. Kern & Associates, Ltd. answer due 10/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 22 Stipulation to Extend Time. Kern & Associates, Ltd. answer due 9/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation to Extend Time. Highland Ranch Homeowners Association answer due 9/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USROF lll Legal Title Trust 2015-1 v. TBD, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airmotive Investments LLC
Represented By: Timothy Rhoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Ranch Homeowners Association
Represented By: Ryan William Leary
Represented By: Holly S Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern & Associates, Ltd.
Represented By: Karen M. Ayarbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBD, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBR I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USROF lll Legal Title Trust 2015-1
Represented By: Paterno C. Jurani
Represented By: Natalie C. Lehman
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?