Patriot Reading Associates, LLC v. Tadlock et al
In Re: Charles H. Tadlock and Mary E. Tadlock
Appellant: Patriot Reading Associates, LLC
Appellee: Charles H. Tadlock and Mary E. Tadlock
Trustee: US Trustee
Case Number: 2:2017cv02096
Filed: August 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that the bankruptcy court's order be, and the same hereby is, AFFIRMED. The clerk is instructed to close the case accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc USBC Clerk - MMM)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. The court will provide appellees with fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to file their answering brief. Thereafter, appellant will have fourteen (14) days to file a reply. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that 7 appellees' Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 15 Motion to Extend Time regarding a Dispositive Matter is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patriot Reading Associates, LLC v. Tadlock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Charles H. Tadlock and Mary E. Tadlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Patriot Reading Associates, LLC
Represented By: Mohamed A Iqbal
Represented By: Christopher Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Charles H. Tadlock
Represented By: Thomas E. Crowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mary E. Tadlock
Represented By: Thomas E. Crowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: US Trustee
Represented By: U.S. Trustee, Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?