Goldberg et al v. Barreca et al
Plaintiff: Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Barbara A. Goldberg and Sheldon F. Goldberg
Defendant: Giacomo Barreca, Jack Barreca, International Beverage Alliance LLC, International Beverage Alliance, LLC and International Beverage, Ltd.
Counter Claimant: Giacomo Barreca, Jack Barreca, International Beverage Alliance LLC, International Beverage Alliance, LLC and International Beverage, Ltd.
Counter Defendant: Giacomo Barreca
Case Number: 2:2017cv02106
Filed: August 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting 69 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER. The parties are instructed to file a status report within 7 days of this order addressing what remains to be done in this case and what action the court must take to help move this case to a resolution. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 49 Barreca's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 50 Barreca's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS F URTHER ORDERED that 60 Judge Ferenbach's R&R be, and the same hereby is, ADOPTED in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 56 plaintiffs' motion to strike be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 17 defendan ts' answer be, and the same hereby is, STRICKEN as to the entity defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 62 plaintiffs' motion for entry of clerk's default be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/26/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for defendants/Counterclaimant.FURTHER ORDERED that International Beverage, LTD., International Beverage Alliance, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company, and International Beverage Alliance, LLC, a Colorado Limited Liability Company, must retain counsel by February 11, 2019. Failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation to the District Judge for sanctions, including case-dispositive sanctions.FURTHER ORD ERED that J. Michael Oakes, Esq. must deliver a copy of this Order to International Beverage, LTD., International Beverage Alliance, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company, and International Beverage Alliance, LLC, a Colorado Limited Liability Com pany. The certificate of delivery must be filed with this Court on or before January 18, 2019.FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Oakes must file with the Court the identity of one or more officers, directors, or managing agent of International Beverage, LT D., International Beverage Alliance, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company, and International Beverage Alliance, LLC, a Colorado Limited Liability Company, known to him, and the last known address(es) and contact information of International Beve rage, LTD., International Beverage Alliance, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company, and International Beverage Alliance, LLC, a Colorado Limited Liability Company, on or before January 18, 2019. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of t his order to Giacomo ("Jack") Barreca. FURTHER ORDERED that a status hearing is scheduled for 10:00 AM, February 19, 2019, in Courtroom 3D.FURTHER ORDERED that an officer, director, or managing agent of International Beverage, LTD., I nternational Beverage Alliance, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company, and International Beverage Alliance, LLC, a Colorado Limited Liability Company, and Giacomo ("Jack") Barreca, must attend the status hearing on 10:00 AM, February 19, 2019, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc Giacomo ("Jack") Barreca - MMM)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that 10 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that 4 Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldberg et al v. Barreca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Giacomo Barreca
Represented By: J. Michael Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Jack Barreca
Represented By: J. Michael Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: International Beverage Alliance LLC
Represented By: J. Michael Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: International Beverage Alliance, LLC
Represented By: J. Michael Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: International Beverage, Ltd.
Represented By: J. Michael Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Giacomo Barreca
Represented By: J. Michael Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giacomo Barreca
Represented By: J. Michael Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Barreca
Represented By: J. Michael Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Beverage Alliance LLC
Represented By: J. Michael Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Beverage Alliance, LLC
Represented By: J. Michael Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Beverage, Ltd.
Represented By: J. Michael Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beneficial Innovations, Inc.
Represented By: R. Duane Frizell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A. Goldberg
Represented By: R. Duane Frizell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheldon F. Goldberg
Represented By: R. Duane Frizell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?