Bank of New York Mellon v. Tierra De Las Palmas Owners Association et al

Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Defendant: Absolute Collections Services, LLC, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Tierra De Las Palmas Owners Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv02112
Filed: August 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 39 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER denying 40 Motion for Protective Order; ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER granting 24 Motion to Dismiss; Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 37 Stipulation to Set Aside Default; Tierra De Las Palmas Owners Association answer due 10 days from date of entry of Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Stipulation; Discovery due by 6/4/2018. Motions due by 7/5/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 Stipulation Re: Second Amended Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition; Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 31 Stipulation; Discovery due by 3/26/2018. Motions due by 4/25/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on Absolute Collections Services, LLC's 9 Motion to Dismiss scheduled for October 25, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. is VACATED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Finance - JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of New York Mellon v. Tierra De Las Palmas Owners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Collections Services, LLC
Represented By: Shane D. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tierra De Las Palmas Owners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?