Cooper v. Credit One Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Bobbie Cooper
Defendant: Credit One Bank, N.A.
Consol Plaintiff: Luis Delgado, Dacia Drury, David McCollough, Cathy Ray, Sean Woodburn and Kenneth Wright
Case Number: 2:2017cv02153
Filed: August 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. The Court ORDERS the parties to file a stipulation of dismissal no later than 8/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Denying 37 Motion to Stay Discovery. The Court ORDERS the parties to file a joint proposed discovery plan and scheduling order, no later than 1/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 36 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Kurt R. Bonds terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Denying 35 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. If Defendant intends to file a motion to stay discovery, it must do so no later than 12/1/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Credit One Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Cooper
Represented By: Michael Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Luis Delgado
Represented By: Michael Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Dacia Drury
Represented By: Michael Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: David McCollough
Represented By: Michael Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Cathy Ray
Represented By: Michael Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Sean Woodburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Kenneth Wright
Represented By: Michael Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?