U.S. Bank, N.A. v. Centeno et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Martin Centeno, Gentle Waters Family Trust and Palo Verde Ranch Homeowners' Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv02166
Filed: August 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDERED that 36 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 38 Motion to Extend Time is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 39 defendant's motion for extension of time be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Defendant will have an additional seven days from the date of this order to file a response to 36 plaintiff's motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that 14 the HOA's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 4 Centeno's Motion to Dismiss is DISMISSED as moot. The clerk is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that 16 Motion to Substitute is GRANTED. Ricardo Fojas shall replace Defendant Gentle Waters Family Trust in this case. FURTHER ORDERED that 17 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Default is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re: 14 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 1/19/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank, N.A. v. Centeno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Centeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gentle Waters Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palo Verde Ranch Homeowners' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael A DiGiacomo
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?