September 14, 2021 |
Filing
198
ORDER - The Court finds that it lacks subject matter jurisdiction over this action. The Court therefore dismisses the claims in this action without prejudice. It is therefore ordered that Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. [126 ]) is denied as moot. It is further ordered that Plaintiff Victoria-Joy Godwin's motion to strike (ECF No. 149 ) is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/14/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
February 1, 2021 |
Filing
193
ORDER granting 191 Motion to Stay Discovery; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulated discovery plan and scheduling order within 14 days of an Order on the pending Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 187 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 2/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
January 26, 2021 |
Filing
190
ORDER granting ECF No. 185 Motion to Stay Discovery; directing the parties to file a stipulated discovery plan and scheduling order within 14 days of an order on the pending ECF Nos. 171 , 179 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
January 21, 2021 |
Filing
189
ORDER - Judge Albregt's Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 180 ) is accepted and adopted in full. Defendant Clark County is dismissed from the entirety of this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
January 5, 2021 |
Filing
180
ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Order ECF No. 108 (ECF No. 111 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants to Comply with Mandat ory Disclosures Under Rule 26 (ECF No. 125 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Order Quashing Service (ECF No. 135 ) is granted in part as to quashing service for insufficient service of process on Defendant Clark County. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Defendant's request for dismissal in the Motion be granted and the undersigned recommends to the District Judge that Defendant Clark County be dismissed from this action. IT IS FURTHE R ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Strike (ECF No. 154 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Order Compelling Service (ECF No. 152 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants 39; Motion to Stay Discovery (ECF No. 167 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery (ECF No. 170 ) is granted. Objections to R&R due by 1/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
December 10, 2020 |
Filing
162
ORDER - Defendant Elizabeth Brown's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 91 ) is granted. All claims against Brown are dismissed with prejudice. It is further ordered that Defendants Steve Grierson, Betty Foley, and Collin Jayne's motio n to dismiss (ECF No. 131 ) is granted. All claims against Grierson, Foley, and Jayne are dismissed with prejudice. It is further ordered that Plaintiff's motion to strike (ECF No. 138 ), which the Court construes as a response to Defendants' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 131 ), is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/10/2020.; (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
October 13, 2020 |
Filing
108
ORDER - Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery (ECF No. 102 ) is granted. The parties shall file a Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order within 14 days of an Order on the pending Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 91 ) to the exte nt that the case survives and review the amendments to the Local Rules of Practice for the District of Nevada that were adopted on April 17, 2020, specifically Local Rules 26-1 through 26-7, to ensure that they submit a compliant plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
September 7, 2020 |
Filing
97
ORDER granting 95 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
August 10, 2020 |
Filing
79
ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion Amend Complaint (ECF No. 64 ) and Re-Submitted Motion for Amending Complaint (ECF No. 65 ) are denied without prejudice. The Motion/Notification of Procedural Anomalies Requiring Clarification (ECF No. 66 ) is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
July 9, 2020 |
Filing
63
ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court must forward the USM-285 forms received (including ECF Nos. 57 and 58 ) and the summonses that have been issued (ECF No. 62 ) to the U.S. Marshal for service upon Defendants. It is further ordered that the Clerk will also send sufficient copies of the Third Amended Complaint (ECF No. 34 ) and this Order to the U.S. Marshal for service on the Defendants. It is further ordered that within 20 days after receiving from the U.S. Marshal a copy of the USM-285 forms showing whether service has been accomplished, Plaintiff must file a notice with the Court identifying which Defendant(s) were served and which were not served, if any. (See pdf order for additional specifics.) Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
June 16, 2020 |
Filing
61
ORDERED that Plaintiff's request for judicial notice of United States v. Sineneng-Smith, 140 S. Ct. 1575 (2020) (ECF No. 55 ) is granted. Plaintiff's first filed motion to vacate (ECF No. 54 ) is denied as moot bec ause it is superseded by Plaintiff's later filed motion seeking the same. Plaintiff's second filed motion to vacate (ECF No. 56 ) is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
May 19, 2020 |
Filing
49
ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Email Address for Use During the Implementation of the Pandemic Restriction (ECF No. 48 ) is granted only to the extent that she is consenting to electronic service via email address. IT IS FU RTHER ORDERED that the Clerk's Office shall add Plaintiff's email address accountable12@yahoo.com to the docket and she will only receive service via email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
April 13, 2020 |
Filing
42
ORDER that the Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 36 ) is accepted and adopted in its entirety; Plaintiff's sixth and seventh claims, as asserted in the TAC, are dismissed from this action and Plaintiff will be allowed to proceed on her other claims; Plaintiff's "addendum" to her Objection (ECF No. 41 ) is stricken; Plaintiff's Objection (ECF No. 39 ) is overruled; Clerk directed to send Plaintiff USM-285 forms and proposed summons forms for each Defendant, along with a copy of this order (Mailed to P on 4/13/2020); Plaintiff must complete the forms with all required information and return them to the Clerk within 30 days of this order. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
|
March 10, 2020 |
Filing
36
ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Amend (ECF No. 32 ) is granted; Plaintiff's Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically (ECF No. 33 ) is granted; Plaintiff must comply with the following procedures to acti vate her CM/ECF account (see order for details); Plaintiff's written certification of completion of CM/ECF tutorial due by 3/31/2020. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff Victoria Joy Godwin's sixth and seventh claims in the Third Amended Complaint be dismissed with prejudice and she be permitted to proceed on the remaining claims with an order directing her to completed USM-285 forms and proposed summons forms for each defendant and return to the Clerk of the Court within thirty days of the Court's order. Objections to R&R due by 3/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
|
December 16, 2019 |
Filing
31
ORDER - Denying ECF No. 30 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Clerk shall mail ECF No. 27 Order, USM-285 Form, a Proposed Summons Form, and a copy of this order to Plaintiff (Mailed to address listed on docket on 12/17/2019). Notice of Compliance and Amended Complaint deadline due by 1/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
October 28, 2019 |
Filing
27
ORDER Claims are dismissed with leave to amend as specified herein. Any "Third Amended" complaint for the three claims specified is due by 11/27/2019 Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a USM-285 form and a proposed summons form, along wit h a copy of this order. (USM-285, Summons form, and Order mailed to P on 10/28/2019.) Upon receipt, Plaintiff must complete both forms with all required information and return them to the Clerk within thirty days. Upon receipt of the completed U SM-285 and proposed summons form, the Court will enter a further order for service upon Defendants. Plaintiff's Motion for Request for Judicial Notice (ECF No. 25 ) is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
March 29, 2018 |
Filing
14
ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOFFMAN. Plaintiff's motion for TRO ECF No. 7 and plaintiff's motions for judicial notice ECF Nos. 8 , 9 are denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
March 9, 2018 |
Filing
11
ORDER that Plaintiff's IFP application (ECF No. 1 ) is GRANTED; Plaintiff's motion for expedited consideration of IFP status (ECF No. 4 ) and motion for judicial notice in support of IFP status (ECF No. 10 ) are DENIED as moot< /b>; Clerk directed to file Plaintiff's complaint (ECF No. 1 -1); Plaintiff's 3rd, 4th, and 5th claims are DISMISSED with leave to amend; amended complaint due by 4/8/2018; Clerk directed to send Plaintiff USM-285 form, propo sed summons form, and a copy of this order; Plaintiff must complete both forms and return them to the Clerk within 30 days; and Plaintiff's motion for judicial notice (ECF No. 5 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|