Goldblatt v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Hal Goldblatt
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2017cv02193
Filed: August 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting ECF No. 21 Joint Stipulation for EAJA Fees. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that the R&R (ECF No. 18 ) is accepted and adopted in full; Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF No. 14 ) is granted in part consistent with the R&R; This case is remanded for the ALJ to properly evaluate the opinion of Dr. Mumford; Defendant's Motion to Affirm (ECF No. 15 ) is denied; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that Mr. Goldblatt's ECF No. 1 IFP application is GRANTED. Clerk shall file the complaint (ECF No. 1 -2) and serve the SSA by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint (ECF No. 1 -2) by certified mail to: (1) the Attorney General and (2) The Regional Chief Counsel. (Cert. Mail Nos. 7013 1710 0001 6894 1917 and 7013 1710 0001 6894 1924) (Mailed 8/25/2016.) Clerk shall issue summons to the AUSA and deliver the summons and Complaint (ECF No. 1 -2) to USM for service. FURTHER ORDERED that henceforth, Mr. Goldblatt must serve Ds or Ds, attorney a copy of every pleading submitted for consideration together with a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldblatt v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Ben A. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hal Goldblatt
Represented By: Hannalore Burns Merritt
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?