H. et al v. Clark County et al
Plaintiff: S. H. and A. O.
Defendant: Kevin Brown, Clark, County of, Eagle Quest, Eagle Quest of Nevada, Inc., Ilia Hampton, Trent Hansen, Tomisha Horn, Juliane Hughes, Ivan Ray Tippetts, Leslie Tippetts and Shera Williams
Case Number: 2:2017cv02380
Filed: September 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting ECF No. 92 Stipulation to Dismiss Defendants Eagle Quest of Nevada, Inc., Eagle Quest, Ivan Ray Tippetts and Leslie Tippetts with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Order granting ECF No. 86 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Extend Time for Plaintiffs' Counsel to File Proof of Blocked Trust Account. Such proof shall be filed by 3/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting ECF No. 84 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice as to Juliane Hughes, Kevin Brown and Clark, County. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER that Plaintiffs' Amended Petition for Minor's Compromise (ECF No. 79 ) is GRANTED; Plaintiffs' counsel shall have until February 1, 2019 to file proof that a blocked account has been set up and settlement proceeds authorized by this order have been deposited; No distributions may be made from the blocked account set up for the minor childwithout the courts approval. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting ECF No. 66 Motion to remove attorney Melanie L. Thomas, Esq. from the Electronic Service List in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting ECF No. 70 Motion : Attorney Matthew Joseph Christian terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/12/2018.; (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting ECF No. 68 Motion to remove attorney John F. Bemis, Esq. from the Electronic Service List in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PROTECTIVE ORDER between Plaintiffs and LV Metropolitan Police Department (See Order for further details and information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER re ECF No. 60 Motion to Compel: Responses due by 7/23/2018. Replies due by 7/25/2018. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2018 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting ECF No. 44 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendants Ilia Hampton and Trent Hansen with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/10/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER - Plaintiffs shall be GRANTED an additional 60 days, or until February 8, 2018, to serve Shera Williams and Tomisha Horn. Plaintiff's ECF No. 27 Motion for Service by Publication is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER approving ECF No. 29 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting ECF No. 26 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Deadlines to ECF No. 22 Motion for Judgment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/13/2017. Responses due by 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H. et al v. Clark County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Brown
Represented By: Thomas D Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark, County of
Represented By: Thomas D Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Quest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Quest of Nevada, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilia Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomisha Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juliane Hughes
Represented By: Thomas D Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan Ray Tippetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Tippetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shera Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. H.
Represented By: Andre M. Lagomarsino
Represented By: Melanie L. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. O.
Represented By: Andre M. Lagomarsino
Represented By: Melanie L. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?