Bank Of New York Mellon v. Heritage Square South Homeowners' Association et al

Plaintiff: Bank Of New York Mellon
Defendant: ATC Assessment Collection Group, LLC, Angius & Terry Collections, LLC, Betty M. Smith Revocable Trust, Heritage Square South Homeowners' Association, Jayem Family LP and Betty M. Smith
Case Number: 2:2017cv02381
Filed: September 11, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion to Remove Counsel from Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 3, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 29 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 13 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 1/9/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 19, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 13 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/27/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 22, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Stipulation; Heritage Square South Homeowners' Association answer due 11/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank Of New York Mellon v. Heritage Square South Homeowners' Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATC Assessment Collection Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angius & Terry Collections, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty M. Smith Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Square South Homeowners' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayem Family LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank Of New York Mellon
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?