Ross v. Sandoval et al

Plaintiff: Jesse Aron Ross
Defendant: Romeo Aranas, James Dzurenda, Doctor Maga Pah, Perry Russell, Brian Sandoval, State of Nevada, J Torress and Brian Williams
Case Number: 2:2017cv02386
Filed: September 11, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 15 the motion to defer filing an amended complaint is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 16 the motion for reconsideration is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 4, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that a decision on 6 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is deferred. FURTHER ORDERED that 2 Motion to Add Pages to Form Complaint is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that 7 Motion to Waive NRS § 41A.071 is deni ed. The clerk shall file the first amended complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff chooses to file a second amended complaint curing the deficiencies of his first amended complaint, as outlined in this order, Plaintiff shall file the second amended complaint within 30 days from the date of entry of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff chooses to file a second amended complaint, the Court will screen the second amended complaint in a separate screening order. The screening pro cess will take several months.FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff chooses not to file a second amended complaint curing the stated deficiencies of the first amended complaint, this action shall only proceed immediately on Counts V and VIII (conditi ons of confinement violations) against Owens, Williams, Russell, and Byrne; Count VI (state law claim) against Owens, Williams, Russell, and Byrne; Count VII (state law claim) against Defendants Owens, Williams, Russell, and Byrne; Count XV (free exe rcise, RLUIPA, and equal protection violations) against Caldrin and Williams; and Count XVII (deliberate indifference to serious dental needs) against Magapah, Torress, Russell, Jane Doe #1, and John Doe #1-A (when Plaintiff learns their identities). FURTHER ORDERED that a decision on 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is deferred. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction (ECF No. 8 ) within 7 days of the date of entry of thi s order. If Plaintiff chooses to file a reply, he shall do so within 10 days after Defendants file a response. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: 1983 form w/instructions & copy of Amd Complaint to plaintiff - MMM)
September 14, 2017 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice to file a new application. The Clerk of the Court SHALL SEND Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner, a s well as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. FURTHER ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either: file a fully complete application to proce ed in forma pauperis, on the correct form with complete financial attachments or pay the full $400 fee for filing a civil action. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Sandoval et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romeo Aranas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Maga Pah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Torress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Aron Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?